blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0901991
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPH1179788Global Dossier 23.03.1999A
Priority number Date
JP23368997 29.08.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0901991Global Dossier 17.05.2000A3
EP0901991 17.03.1999A2
Priority number Date
JP23368997 29.08.1997