Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0901991

EP0901991 - Photocatalytic glass pane and method for producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.06.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.08.2001 [2001/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED
5253 Oaza Okiube
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755-0001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/11]For all designated states
Central Glass Company, Limited
5253 Oaza Okiube
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755-0001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Inoue, Motoharu Research Inst. for Ind. Techno. of
Central Glass Company, Ltd. 1510, Oguchi-cho
Matsusaka-shi, Mie 515-0001 / JP
02 / Waseda, Ryuta Research Instit. for Ind. Techno. of
Central Glass Company, Ltd. 1510, Oguchi-cho
Matsusaka-shi, Mie 515-0001 / JP
[1999/11]
Representative(s)Schmidt, Christian , et al
Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/11]Schmidt, Christian , et al
Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR, Robert-Koch-Strasse 1
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98116216.727.08.1998
[1999/11]
Priority number, dateJP1997023368929.08.1997         Original published format: JP 23368997
[1999/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0901991
Date:17.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0901991
Date:17.05.2000
[2000/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:C03C17/245, C03C17/34
[1999/11]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/04]
Former [1999/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Photokatalytische Glasscheiben und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[1999/11]
English:Photocatalytic glass pane and method for producing same[1999/11]
French:Plat de verre photocatalytique et moyen pour sa fabrication[1999/11]
Examination procedure18.11.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/33]
13.03.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
27.12.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
27.12.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
27.12.2000M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0911300  (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-5,8,9,11,13,14,17-19,25,26 * examples 2,5 *;
 [A]US4536241  (LOGOTHETIS ELEFTHERIOS M [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * column 3, line 12 - line 21 *;
 [A]US4504522  (KAISER WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * column 3, line 12 - line 19 *;
 [A]US5262199  (DESU SESHU [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * column W *;
 [A]US4980203  (DABOSI FRANCIS J P [FR], et al) [A] 1-31 * column W *;
 [A]DE3512825  (STIFTUNG INST FUER HAERTEREI T [DE]) [A] 1-31 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - KAMATA, KIICHIRO ET. AL, "Rapid formation of TiO2 films by a conventional CVD method", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE LETTERS., CHAPMAN AND HALL., GB, (1990), no. 9, ISSN 0261-8028, pages 316 - 319, XP000881509 [X] 1-31 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00725836
 [A]  - TANAKA, NORIO ET AL, "Preferential orientation of titanium dioxide polycrystalline films using atmospheric CVD technique", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19970929), vol. 127, no. 13, Database accession no. 179839, XP002133118 [A] 1-31 * abstract *
    [] - J. CERAM. SOC. JPN. (1997), 105(JULY), 551-554
 [A]  - KAMATA, KIICHIRO ET AL, "Synthesis of titanium dioxide films by laser chemical vapor deposition (CVD)", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900305), vol. 112, no. 10, Database accession no. 82730, XP002133119 [A] 1-31 * abstract *
    [] - NIPPON SERAMIKKUSU KYOKAI GAKUJUTSU RONBUNSHI (1989), 97(12), 1534-6
 [A]  - KOMIYAMA H. ET AL., "Particle precipitation aided CVD for rapid growth of ceramic films", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, NEW YORK,NY, US, (198708), pages 1119 - 1128, XP000881749 [A] 1-31 * the whole document *