Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0920994

EP0920994 - Method of determination of colour values [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 19.03.2008  [2008/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Former [1999/23]For all designated states
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ott, Hans
Ostring 54
8105 Regensdorf / CH
02 / Pfeiffer, Nikolaus
Peter-Wenzel-Weg 15/1
69118 Heidelberg / DE
03 / Schneider, Manfred
Schronnenäckerstrasse 16
74906 Bad Rappenau / DE
[1999/23]
Representative(s)Pudimat, Roland , et al
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/23]Pudimat, Roland , et al
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG, Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Application number, filing date98116288.628.08.1998
[1999/23]
Priority number, dateDE199714906306.11.1997         Original published format: DE 19749063
[1999/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0920994
Date:09.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0920994
Date:10.11.1999
[1999/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0920994
Date:20.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:B41F33/00
[1999/23]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/29]
Former [1999/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Gewinnung von Farbmesswerten[1999/23]
English:Method of determination of colour values[1999/23]
French:Procédé pour la détermination de valeurs de couleur[1999/23]
Examination procedure28.08.1998Examination requested  [1999/23]
14.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2002Fee for grant paid
29.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
[2008/12]
Former [2003/30]NL20.11.2002
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0659559  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 4, line 23 - line 48 * * column 7, lines 17-24; claims 2,4 * [Y] 5-7;
 [X]WO9500336  (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-7 * page 30, paragraph 1 *;
 [Y]DE4415486  (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [Y] 5-7 * column 1, lines 34-39 * * column 3, lines 12-46 *;
 [Y]EP0527285  (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [Y] 5-7 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 8 *;
 [Y]EP0228347  (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG ;GRETAG AG (CH)) [Y] 1-7 * column 5, lines 22-29 *;
 [Y]EP0143744  (GRETAG AG) [Y] 1-7 * page 4, line 24 - page 6, line 60; claims 1,7-9 *;
 [Y]EP0142470  (GRETAG AG) [Y] 1-7 * column 6, line 25 - column 7, line 33; claims 1,11 *