blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0971475 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0971475



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 143
10.02.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
20.09.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
09.09.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
11.03.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
03.03.2005 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.03.2005 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
24.02.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.11.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.11.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.11.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
22.11.2004 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
22.11.2004 Translation of priority document Search / examination 14
05.10.2004 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
02.08.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
02.08.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
02.08.2004 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
02.08.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
19.05.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
19.05.2004 Claims Search / examination 4
19.05.2004 Description Search / examination 5
19.05.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.05.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 14
27.01.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
27.01.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.10.2003 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
24.06.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
02.04.2003 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 2
02.04.2003 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
07.10.2002 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
15.01.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
27.12.2001 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
27.12.2001 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 2
27.03.2000 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 2
18.01.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
01.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
17.06.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
17.06.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.06.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
28.08.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.08.1998 Claims Search / examination 3
28.08.1998 Description Search / examination 10
28.08.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.08.1998 Drawings Search / examination 1
28.08.1998 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
28.08.1998 Priority document Search / examination 17
28.08.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7