blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0971475


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
10.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2006  [2006/13]
10.02.2006 No opposition filed within time limit published on  29.03.2006  [2006/13]
28.10.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2005  [2005/50]
16.09.2005 Change - representative published on  02.11.2005  [2005/44]
18.02.2005 (Expected) grant published on  06.04.2005  [2005/14]
04.02.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
04.02.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.12.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
03.12.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
01.10.2004 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
28.07.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.05.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
24.01.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.01.2004 First examination report
14.01.2004 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
14.01.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.10.2003 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
20.06.2003 Change - applicant published on  06.08.2003  [2003/32]
12.03.2003 Surcharge for renewal fee
12.03.2003 Renewal fee
02.10.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
11.01.2002 Change - applicant published on  27.02.2002  [2002/09]
31.07.2001 Renewal fee
02.10.2000 Change - extension states
04.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  20.09.2000 [2000/38]
28.07.2000 Renewal fee
07.04.2000 Request for examination filed published on  24.05.2000 [2000/21]
26.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]