Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971475

EP0971475 - Stator of single-phase electric motor with four poles having parallel axes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2006
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI, NL, PT
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Promotional Activity S.A.
9-11, rue Goethe
1637 Luxembourg / LU
[2003/32]
Former [2002/09]For all designated states
Phoenix Technologies Holding S.A.
9/11, rue Goethe
1637 Luxemburg / LU
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
European Electric Motors Design and Engineering Anstalt
Im Ziel 30
9493 Mauren / LI
Inventor(s)01 / Gutris, Giorgio
Via Quintino Sella 5
20121 Milano / IT
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2005/44]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16
20123 Milano / IT
Former [2000/02]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98116350.428.08.1998
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateIT1998MI0153706.07.1998         Original published format: IT MI981537
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971475
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971475
Date:06.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02K21/18, H02K1/14
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Stator eines Einphasenelektromotors mit vier parallelen Polen[2000/02]
English:Stator of single-phase electric motor with four poles having parallel axes[2000/02]
French:Stator de moteur électrique à quatre pôles ayant des axes parallèles[2000/02]
Examination procedure27.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
27.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2004Fee for grant paid
23.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
25.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200205   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2003
31.08.200306   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.2003
31.08.200407   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
CH06.04.2005
LI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
[2006/14]
Former [2006/13]AT06.04.2005
BE06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
Former [2005/50]SE06.07.2005
Documents cited:Search[YA]WO9624187  (STEINER ROBERT E [US]) [Y] 1 * page 16, line 15 - page 17, line 13 * * page 24, line 20 - line 28 * * page 25, line 18 - page 26, line 3; figures 1,3,18-24 * [A] 2,3;
 [Y]EP0397143  (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 3, column 3, line 42 - line 49; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5130591  (SATO HIRONOBU [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 9; figures 1,3 *
ExaminationDE1942765
 GB459351