Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0983829

EP0983829 - Method and apparatus for gluing strips of veneer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 19.03.2008  [2008/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heinrich Kuper GmbH & Co. KG
Bruchstrasse 13-19
D-33397 Rietberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/23]For all designated states
Heinrich Kuper GmbH & Co KG
Bruchstrasse 13-19
D-33397 Rietberg / DE
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
HEINRICH KUPER GMBH & CO KG
Bruchstrasse 13-19
D-33397 Rietberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Runge, Carsten
Auf dem Lohfelde 33
49152 Bad Essen / DE
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Schmitz, Hans-Werner
Hoefer & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]Schmitz, Hans-Werner, Dipl.-Ing.
Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date98116423.931.08.1998
[2000/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0983829
Date:08.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0983829
Date:07.06.2006
Language:DE
[2006/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP20.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B27D1/10, H05B6/64
[2000/10]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   IT,   LI,   PT,   SE [2000/46]
Former [2000/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verkleben von Furnierstreifen[2000/10]
English:Method and apparatus for gluing strips of veneer[2000/10]
French:Procédé et appareil pour le collage de feuilles de placage[2000/10]
Examination procedure04.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
12.09.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DE, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL
25.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2005Date of oral proceedings
12.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.03.2006Fee for grant paid
21.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
26.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.10.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipPT07.11.2006
[2007/17]
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0830924  (MEINAN MACHINERY WORKS [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,8,10 * column 1, line 12 - line 27 * * column 1, line 45 - line 56 * [Y] 3,4,6,7,9,11;
 [Y]JPS59187071  ;
 [Y]JPS6072973  ;
 [Y]US5364333  (GULLIVER RICHARD F [US], et al) [Y] 6,7,11 * column 5, line 68 - column 6, line 13 *;
 [Y]DE3304315  (KUPER HEINRICH GMBH CO KG [DE]) [Y] 9 * page 12, line 5 - line 9; figures 2,3 *;
 [X]WO9605035  (SCHILCHER INDUSTRIEANLAGEN UND [AT], et al) [X] 1,2,8,10 * claim 20 *;
 [A]JPH04104866  ;
 [A]JPH02225001  ;
 [A]JPH02139810  ;
 [A]BE487545  (BELL TELEPHONE);
 [A]WO9627482  (STENLUND MASKINER AB [SE], et al);
 [A]US3021248  (MANN JULIUS W, et al)
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850226), vol. 009, no. 045, Database accession no. (C - 268), [Y] 3 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850822), vol. 009, no. 205, Database accession no. (C - 299), [Y] 4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920728), vol. 016, no. 349, Database accession no. (C - 0967), [A] 5,6,11 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901122), vol. 014, no. 532, Database accession no. (M - 1051), [A] 6,7 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900816), vol. 014, no. 380, Database accession no. (E - 0965), [A] 12 * abstract *