Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0919961

EP0919961 - Security element for documents and method for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstrasse 91
10958 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/14]For all designated states
BUNDESDRUCKEREI GmbH
Oranienstrasse 91
D-10958 Berlin / DE
Former [1999/22]For all designated states
HSM Holographic Systems München GmbH
Melchior-Huber-Strasse 25
85652 Ottersberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Lang, Christian
Am Urtel 12
85652 Pliening / DE
02 / De Jongh, Rudi
Naabstrasse 23
83026 Rosenheim / DE
03 / Dausmann, Günther
Schlachthausstrasse 7
85435 Erding / DE
04 / Hoeppner, Harald
Aschaffenburger Strasse 33
12309 Berlin / DE
05 / Löer, Thomas
Wilmstrasse 21B
10961 Berlin / DE
06 / Märtens, Detlef
An den Haselbüschen 19
13599 Berlin / DE
[1999/22]
Representative(s)Zinnecker, Armin , et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Zinnecker, Armin , et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Former [1999/22]Zinnecker, Armin, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98116431.231.08.1998
[1999/22]
Priority number, dateDE199715270427.11.1997         Original published format: DE 19752704
DE199811013409.03.1998         Original published format: DE 19810134
[1999/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0919961
Date:02.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0919961
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0919961
Date:11.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G07D7/00
[1999/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
Former [1999/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Sicherheitselement für Dokumente und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[1999/22]
English:Security element for documents and method for its manufacture[1999/22]
French:Elément de sécurité pour documents et son procédé de fabrication[1999/22]
Examination procedure04.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
20.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.02.2003Fee for grant paid
11.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5101184  (ANTES GREGOR [CH]) [X] 1,3,5,6 * figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 2,4,7;
 [YA]US4832445  (HAINES KENNETH A [US], et al) [Y] 2,4,7 * figure 4; claim 1 * [A] 1,3,5,6;
 [A]US4761543  (HAYDEN KENNETH J [GB]) [A] 1-7 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5221957  (JANNSON TOMASZ P [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * claim 1 *