Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0985741

EP0985741 - Modulated plasma glow discharge treatments for making super hydrophobic substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.09.2004
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.11.2004  [2004/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / D'Agostino, Riccardo
Via Orabona, 4
70126 Bari / IT
02 / Lamendola, Rotalba
Via Orabona, 4
70126 Bari / IT
03 / Favia, Pietro
Via Orabona, 4
70126 Bari / IT
04 / Corzani, Italo
Via Fonteveccia, 40
66100 Chieti / IT
05 / Palumbo, Gianfranco
Georgenfeld 7
61348 Bad Homburg / DE
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Veronese, Pancrazio , et al
Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A.
Centro Tecnico di Sambuceto
Via Aterno 128/130
Sambuceto
66020 San Giovanni Teatino (CH) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2004/33]Veronese, Pancrazio , et al
Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Italian Research Center Via Aterno 92/94
66020 Sambuceto di San Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT
Former [2000/11]Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. , et al
Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH
65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date98116895.807.09.1998
[2000/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0985741
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:C23C16/50, C23C16/30, B05D7/24
[2000/11]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/47]
Former [2000/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Modulierte Plasma-Glimmentladung-Behandlungen zur Herstellung super-hydrophober Substrate[2000/11]
English:Modulated plasma glow discharge treatments for making super hydrophobic substrates[2000/11]
French:Traitements par plasma de décharge luminescente pour la fabrication de substrats super-hydrophobiques[2000/11]
Examination procedure01.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/45]
27.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
05.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9742356  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1-4,6-10,13 * page 9, line 3 - page 15, line 2; claims 16,18-20,24 * [Y] 5;
 [Y]JPH036204  ;
 [A]US4632842  (KARWOSKI THEODORE [US], et al);
 [A]EP0531029  (GEN ELECTRIC [US])
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910318), vol. 015, no. 112, Database accession no. (C - 0815), [Y] 5 * abstract *