Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994288

EP0994288 - Apparatus for connecting a volumetric flow meter to a pipeline [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.12.2007
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.01.2008  [2008/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beninga, Ewald
Donnersbergerstrasse 30
60528 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2007/32]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Beninga, Ewald
Unterschweinsstiege 4
60549 Frankfurt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Kühl, Oliver
Dierks & Kühl Rechtsanwälte Rossmarkt 17
60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2007/39]
Application number, filing date98116994.908.09.1998
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994288
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16L41/00, F16L41/02, G01F15/18
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FI,   IE,   LI,   LU,   PT,   SE [2001/10]
Former [2001/09]AT,  CH,  DK,  FI,  IE,  LI,  LU,  PT,  SE 
Former [2000/52]AT 
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Verbinden einer Volumenstrom-Messeinrichtung mit einer flüssigkeitsführenden Rohrleitung[2000/16]
English:Apparatus for connecting a volumetric flow meter to a pipeline[2000/16]
French:Dispositif de raccordement d'un débitmètre volumétrique à une canalisation[2000/16]
Examination procedure18.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
20.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
31.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, MC, NL
07.07.2004Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
01.09.2004Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted
18.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/04]
27.08.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
02.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000CH   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.2000
23.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000DE   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.2000
23.11.2000DK   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.2000
23.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000FI   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.2000
23.11.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000IE   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.2000
23.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000LU   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.2000
23.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000PT   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.2000
23.11.2000SE   M01   Fee paid on   28.12.2000
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200003   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.2000
30.09.200104   M06   Fee paid on   21.11.2001
30.09.200205   M06   Fee paid on   01.04.2003
30.09.200306   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2004
30.09.200508   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2006
30.09.200609   M06   Fee paid on   02.04.2007
30.09.200710   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0344777  (STEGMEIER KARL) [X] 1,2 * column 9, line 43 - column 12, line 25; figures 1-5 * [Y] 3;
 [YA]DE3627393  (CONGERMANIA MESS & REGEL) [Y] 3 * abstract * [A] 1,2;
 [A]DE3242763  (SAMECO ING J SCHACHE GMBH HAUS [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]DE2255493  (SCHAEFER WERKE KG) [A] 1,2 * figure 2; claim 1 *