Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0985994

EP0985994 - Method and device for inputting process parameters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.06.2001
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.08.2001 [2001/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Electrowatt Technology Innovation AG
6301 Zug / CH
[2000/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Copley, Jonathan Miles
Seestrasse 7
6330 Cham / CH
02 / Hauser, Thomas
Mugerenmatt 3
6330 Cham / CH
[2000/11]
Application number, filing date98117217.411.09.1998
[2000/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0985994
Date:15.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:G05D23/19, G05B19/10, G06K11/18, G06F3/033
[2000/11]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/47]
Former [2000/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Eingabe von Prozessparametern[2000/11]
English:Method and device for inputting process parameters[2000/11]
French:Procédé et dispositif d'entrée des paramètres d'un processus[2000/11]
Examination procedure18.09.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/31]
13.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/31]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.10.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.10.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
25.10.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0460676  (OMRON CORP.) [X] 1,3,5,7-9,15,16 * column 5, line 6 - line 12 * * column 7, line 33 - column 8, line 16; figures 2,3,9-13 * [Y] 2,4,10-13;
 [X]US5782189  (T. HIRATA ET AL.) [X] 1-3,5,7-9,15,16 * column 10, line 5 - line 67; figures 11-16 *;
 [X]EP0597467  (KALTENBACH & VOIGT GMBH & CO.) [X] 1-4,6-9,15,16 * column 9, line 36 - column 11, line 49; figures 1-11 *;
 [Y]EP0573827  (ZELTRON) [Y] 2,4,11-13 * column 2, line 40 - line 53 * * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 50; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]GB2238388  (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC AND ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES) [Y] 10 * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 10 *;
 [AD]EP0332957  (TEM AG) [AD] 1,8 * abstract *;
 [A]DE29600654U  (GRÄSSLIN KG) [A] 1,8 * figures 1-7; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]EP0609030  (SUN MICROSYSTEMS) [A] 14 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 45 * * column 9, line 12 - line 29; figures 1-7 *