Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0905204

EP0905204 - Surface-modified platy substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 19.03.2008  [2008/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Patent GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/13]For all designated states
MERCK PATENT GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Herget, Gerhard, Dr.
Potsdamer Strasse 73
64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE
02 / Husseini, Brigitte
Otto-Hesse-Weg 4
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[1999/13]
Application number, filing date98117298.412.09.1998
[1999/13]
Priority number, dateDE199714255126.09.1997         Original published format: DE 19742551
DE199810180920.01.1998         Original published format: DE 19801809
[1999/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0905204
Date:31.03.1999
Language:DE
[1999/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0905204
Date:06.05.1999
[1999/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0905204
Date:20.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:C09C1/00, C11D17/00, C09D7/12, C09D11/00, C08K3/00, A61K7/00
[1999/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/03]
Former [1999/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Oberflächenmodifizierte plättchenförmige Substrate[1999/13]
English:Surface-modified platy substrates[1999/13]
French:Substrats en paillettes modifiées superficiellement[1999/13]
Examination procedure09.10.1999Examination requested  [1999/49]
07.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.05.2002Fee for grant paid
27.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI20.11.2002
IT20.11.2002
ES29.05.2003
[2008/12]
Former [2004/04]FI20.11.2002
ES29.05.2003
Former [2003/43]FI20.11.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0523357  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,7,8 * claims 1-3,7,8 * * page 3, line 2 - line 14 *;
 [PXA]EP0803552  (ECKART STANDARD BRONZEPULVER [DE]) [PX] 10,11 * claims 1,3,4,6,7,14,16 * * column 3, line 2 - line 22 * [A] 7,9,12