Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0905170

EP0905170 - Polybenzoxazoles and polybenzothiazoles precursors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.09.2014
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2014No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.10.2014  [2014/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qimonda AG
Gustav-Heinemann-Ring 212
81739 München / DE
[2011/04]
Former [2010/22]For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
Am Campeon 1-12
85579 Neubiberg / DE
Former [2001/40]For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
Former [1999/13]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Sezi, Recai Dr.
Weiherstrasse 14
91341 Röttenbach / DE
02 / Keitmann, Michael
Goethestrasse 39
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
[1999/13]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/44]Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2001/40]Epping Hermann & Fischer
Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date98117334.712.09.1998
[1999/13]
Priority number, dateDE199714219124.09.1997         Original published format: DE 19742191
[1999/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0905170
Date:31.03.1999
Language:DE
[1999/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0905170
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0905170
Date:30.10.2013
Language:DE
[2013/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08G73/22, C08G75/32, G03F7/038
[1999/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/38]
Former [1999/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Polybenzoxazol- und Polybenzothiazol-Vorstufen[1999/13]
English:Polybenzoxazoles and polybenzothiazoles precursors[1999/13]
French:Précurseurs de polybenzoxazoles et de polybenzothiazoles[1999/13]
Examination procedure26.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
10.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
02.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.2013Fee for grant paid
27.08.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.02.2004
Opposition(s)31.07.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
28.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
13.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
16.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
30.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
15.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
14.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 15
17.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 16
Documents cited:SearchSU1205518  [ ] (OTDEL NEFTEKHIMII I FIZ ORCH K [SU]);
 [A]DE2647004  (KORSCHAK VASILIJ VLADIMIROVITS, et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]FR2595362  (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 9-13 *;
 [A]EP0733665  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * claims 1-9 *
 [X]  - IGNATENKO ET AL., "BIS(3-AMINO-4-HYDROXYPHENOXY)PERFLUOROARYLENES AS MONOMERS FOR PRODUCING POLYBENZOXAZOLES WITH HIGHER THERMAL AND HYDROLYTIC STABILITY", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870309), vol. 106, no. 10, Database accession no. 67818y, XP002088350 [X] 1 * abstract *
ExaminationDE3716629
    - WINZELER ET AL., "The synthesis of 6F bis(o-aminophenol) monomers by a nucleophilic substitution reaction", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940404), vol. 120, no. 14, Database accession no. 164950g, XP002088351