Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0908432

EP0908432 - Process for the obtention of an organic fertiliser made from solid urban waste, the organic fraction thereof or from green wastes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.09.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.09.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.10.2001 [2001/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
S.I.T. Società Igiene Territorio s.r.l.
Via delle Fontanine, 8/10
36040 Brendola (Vicenza) / IT
[1999/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Greselin, Michele
Via Monte Grappa, 26
36050 Cartigliano (Vicenza) / IT
02 / Vaccari, Giuseppe
c/o Dipartimento di Chimica V.L. Bersari
44100 Ferrara / IT
03 / Dosi, Elisabetta
c/o Dipartimento di Chimica V.L. Bersani
44100 Ferrara / IT
04 / Mantovani, Giorgio
c/o Dipartimento di Chimica V.L. Bersani
44100 Ferrara / IT
[1999/15]
Representative(s)Bettello, Pietro , et al
Studio Tecnico
Ingg. Luigi e Pietro Bettello
Via Col d'Echele, 25
36100 Vicenza / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/15]Bettello, Pietro, Dott. Ing. , et al
Studio Tecnico Ingg. Luigi e Pietro Bettello Via Col d'Echele, 25
36100 Vicenza / IT
Application number, filing date98117348.714.09.1998
[1999/15]
Priority number, dateIT1997VI0015616.09.1997         Original published format: IT VI970156
[1999/15]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0908432
Date:14.04.1999
Language:FR
[1999/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0908432
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C05F17/00, C05F9/04, C05F5/00
[2000/03]
Former International [1999/15]C05F17/00, C05F9/04
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GR,   IT,   LU,   NL [2000/39]
Former [1999/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von einem organischen Düngemittel aus festen städtischen Abfällen oder dessen organischen Anteilen oder aus Grünabfällen[1999/15]
English:Process for the obtention of an organic fertiliser made from solid urban waste, the organic fraction thereof or from green wastes[1999/15]
French:Procédé de production d'engrais organique à partir des déchets urbains solides, de la fraction organique de ces derniers ou de residus "verts".[1999/15]
Examination procedure11.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
20.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
01.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, GB, IE, LI, MC, PT, SE
04.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/43]
25.05.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB1299630  (RUMENCO LTD) [X] 1,3,5 * the whole document * [A] 1-5;
 [X]EP0482407  (HUNZIKER ERWIN SEN [CH]) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document *;
 [XA]WO9200942  (CLANCY MARTIN [IE]) [X] 1,3,5 * claim - * * page 6, line 25 - page 5, line 38 * [A] 1-5;
 [X]DE2843928  (NOCKEMANN OTTO, et al) [X] 1,5 * claim - * * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 4 *;
 [X]US4342650  (ERICKSON LENNART G, et al) [X] 1,2,5 * claim - * * column 5, line 52 - column 12, line 50 *;
 [X]FR2546161  (PARPEIX ALAIN [FR]) [X] 1,5 * claim - * * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 11 *;
 [A]EP0063622  (SCHMITTMANN SK PHARMA [DE]) [A] 1-5 * claim - * * page 7, line 36 - page 11, line 19 *