Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0911675

EP0911675 - Method for mounting an electrically conductable display [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/17]Method and device for mounting an electrically contactable display
[2004/35]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.2006
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[1999/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Ziegler, Elmar
Rutesheimer Strasse 13
71272 Renningen / DE
02 / Borsdorf, Uwe
Seestrasse 47
71229 Leonberg / DE
[1999/17]
Application number, filing date98117352.914.09.1998
[1999/17]
Priority number, dateDE199714728825.10.1997         Original published format: DE 19747288
[1999/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0911675
Date:28.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0911675
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0911675
Date:09.03.2005
Language:DE
[2005/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/13
[1999/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/39]
Former [1999/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Einbauverfahren für eine elektrisch kontaktierbare Anzeigeeinrichtung[2004/35]
English:Method for mounting an electrically conductable display[2004/35]
French:Méthode de montage d'un dispositif d'affichage électriquement contacté[2004/35]
Former [1999/17]Einbauvorrichtung und -verfahren für eine elektrisch kontaktierbare Anzeigeeinrichtung
Former [1999/17]Method and device for mounting an electrically contactable display
Former [1999/17]Dispositif et méthode de montage d'un dispositif d'affichage électriquement contacté
Examination procedure19.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
14.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.01.2005Fee for grant paid
04.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR09.03.2005
GB09.03.2005
IT09.03.2005
ES20.06.2005
[2008/52]
Former [2008/45]GB09.03.2005
IT09.03.2005
ES20.06.2005
FR30.09.2005
Former [2008/12]GB09.03.2005
IT09.03.2005
ES20.06.2005
Former [2006/14]GB09.03.2005
ES20.06.2005
Former [2006/13]GB09.03.2005
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0503427  (FLUKE MFG CO JOHN [US]) [X] 1-4,10,12,13 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 6; figures 1,3 * [A] 16;
 [XA]JPH08313880  ;
 [A]JPS57161722
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 199, no. 703, [X] 1-4,7,10-13 * abstract * [A] 14,16
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821224), vol. 006, no. 265, Database accession no. (P - 165), [A] 6,7 * abstract *
ExaminationJPH0432800
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920514), vol. 016, no. 201, Database accession no. (P - 1352),