Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0903095

EP0903095 - Freezer chest for frozen products,especially for ice-creams and deep-frozen food [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 23.05.2007  [2007/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Service des Brevets
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[N/P]
Former [2005/05]For all designated states
NESTEC S.A.
Service des Brevets Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [1999/12]For all designated states
Schöller Lebensmittel GmbH & Co. KG
Bucher Strasse 137
D-90419 Nürnberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Beer, Richard
Castellstrasse 86b
90451 Nürnberg / DE
02 / Göttfert, Thomas
Rüderner Strasse 32a
90599 Dietenhofen / DE
03 / Schopper, Richard
Friedenstrasse 14
90765 Fürth / DE
04 / Vorndran, Thomas
Storchenweg 12
90480 Nürnberg / DE
05 / Faisst, Peter
Eugen-Nägele-Strasse 4
72250 Freudenstadt / DE
06 / Ocker, Frank
Habighorster Weg 18
29348 Eschede / DE
07 / Maul, Andrea
Michaela Strasse 23
90425 Nürnberg / DE
08 / Kohlhoff, Claudia
Gostenhofer Hauptstrasse 31
90443 Nürnberg / DE
09 / Linde, Hansjürgen, Prof. Dr. Ing.
Hutholzweg 18
96450 Coburg / DE
10 / Neumann, Uwe
Postfach 2534
96414 Coburg / DE
11 / Stauch, Rüdiger
Kuppenheimer Strasse 6
76532 Baden-Baden / DE
12 / Rehklau, Andreas
Kleiberweg 13
85356 Freising / DE
[1999/12]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian , et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/05]Rupp, Christian, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
Former [1999/12]Körfer, Thomas, Dipl.-Phys.
Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date98117488.115.09.1998
[1999/12]
Priority number, dateDE199714090317.09.1997         Original published format: DE 19740903
[1999/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0903095
Date:24.03.1999
Language:DE
[1999/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0903095
Date:25.10.2000
[2000/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0903095
Date:06.07.2005
Language:DE
[2005/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP11.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:A47F3/04
[1999/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/37]
Former [2001/29]AT,  BE,  DE,  DK,  FR,  GB,  LU,  NL 
Former [1999/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Tiefkühltruhe für Kühlgut, insbesondere für Speiseeis und Tiefkühlkost[1999/12]
English:Freezer chest for frozen products,especially for ice-creams and deep-frozen food[1999/12]
French:Coffre congélateur pour produits réfrigérés,en particulier pour glaces et produits alimentaires surgelés[1999/12]
Examination procedure23.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/12]
08.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2005Fee for grant paid
29.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.06.2001CH   M01   Fee paid on   10.07.2001
19.06.2001CY   M01   Fee paid on   10.07.2001
19.06.2001ES   M01   Fee paid on   10.07.2001
19.06.2001FI   M01   Fee paid on   10.07.2001
19.06.2001GR   M01   Fee paid on   10.07.2001
19.06.2001IE   M01   Fee paid on   10.07.2001
19.06.2001IT   M01   Fee paid on   10.07.2001
19.06.2001MC   M01   Fee paid on   10.07.2001
19.06.2001PT   M01   Fee paid on   10.07.2001
19.06.2001SE   M01   Fee paid on   10.07.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI06.07.2005
IE06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
AT15.09.2005
CY15.09.2005
BE30.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
[2007/21]
Former [2007/17]FI06.07.2005
IE06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
AT15.09.2005
BE30.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2007/01]FI06.07.2005
IE06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
AT15.09.2005
BE30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/36]FI06.07.2005
IE06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
BE30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/30]FI06.07.2005
IE06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
MC30.09.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/26]FI06.07.2005
IE06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/25]FI06.07.2005
IE06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/22]FI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/14]FI06.07.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/13]FI06.07.2005
SE06.10.2005
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2438972  (HOFFMAN CYRUS F) [X] 1-5,7,9-11,13,15 * column 2, line 21 - line 41; figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 25 - line 40 * * column 4, line 12 - line 15 * [A] 6,12,14;
 [XA]FR2058721  (BARROERO LOUIS) [X] 1,3,5,6,9,15 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 10; figures 3-6 * * page 2, line 17 - line 20 * [A] 2,4;
 [YA]DE29613952U  (SCHOELLER LEBENSMITTEL [DE]) [Y] 1-3,7-10,13,15 * page 3, line 15 - page 5, line 26; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [A] 4-6,11,12,14;
 [Y]DE1401078  (SIEMENS ELEKTROGERAETE GMBH) [Y] 1-3,7-10,13,15 * page 1 - page 3 *