Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0943908

EP0943908 - Displaying device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.05.2003
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.07.2003  [2003/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kobold, Klaus
Kuipersstraat 7
2000 Antwerpen / BE
[1999/38]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/38]
Representative(s)Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Friedrichstraße 2-6
60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/38]KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN
Patentanwälte, Cronstettenstrasse 66
60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date98117575.516.09.1998
[1999/38]
Priority number, dateDE199811197019.03.1998         Original published format: DE 19811970
[1999/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0943908
Date:22.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0943908
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0943908
Date:24.07.2002
Language:DE
[2002/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01L19/14, G01D11/24
[2000/03]
Former International [1999/38]G01L19/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/40]
Former [1999/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Messanzeigevorrichtung[1999/38]
English:Displaying device[1999/38]
French:Dispositif d'affichage[1999/38]
Examination procedure24.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
09.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT
01.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2002Fee for grant paid
22.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE29511976U  (ENVEC MESS UND REGELTECHN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,3,4 * page 2 - page 5; figures 1,2A,3A *;
 [A]DE9109176U  (CENTRA-BÜRKLE GMBH) [A] 1-11 * figure 2 *
 [YA]  DOUGLAS M. CONSIDINE, Process Instruments and Control Handbook, NEW YORK, MCGRAW-HILL BOOK COMPANY, XP002123753 [Y] 1-8 * page 3.32 - page 3.36 * [A] 9-11
 [Y]  BERGE G, "DRUCKMESSTECHNIK - NEUE MOGLICHKEITEN DURCH DIE KOMBINATION INNOVATIVER TECHNIKEN", MESSEN PRUFEN AUTOMATISIEREN. INTERNATIONALES FACHJOURNAL FUR MESS-, STEUER- UND REGELTECHNIK,DE,HANS HOLZMANN VERLAG. BAD WORISHOFEN, no. 5, page 218-222, XP000052154 [Y] 2,5-8 * the whole document *