Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0987650

EP0987650 - Method and apparatus for applying an image to a carrier [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  13.07.2012
Database last updated on 25.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2012Opposition rejectedpublished on 15.08.2012  [2012/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dynatrends AG
Gallusstrasse 59
9500 Wil / CH
[2000/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Oertle, Erwin
Kreuzstrasse 33
9100 Herisau / CH
02 / Müller, Rainer
Lindenstrasse 14
9500 Wil / CH
[2000/12]
Representative(s)Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
[2011/27]
Former [2000/12]Wenger, René , et al
Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
Application number, filing date98117696.918.09.1998
[2000/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0987650
Date:22.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0987650
Date:15.09.2004
Language:DE
[2004/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06K17/00, G06K1/12
[2000/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI [2000/48]
Former [2000/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Applizieren eines Bildes auf einen Träger[2000/12]
English:Method and apparatus for applying an image to a carrier[2000/12]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour l'application d'une image sur un support[2003/44]
Former [2000/12]Procédé et dispositif pour l'application d'un image sur un support
Examination procedure18.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
23.09.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
05.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
19.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
10.07.2004Fee for grant paid
10.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.06.2005  27.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2005/32]
Opponent(s)01  15.06.2005  27.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
D-81677 München / DE
22.07.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.11.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.08.2011Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.08.2011
24.08.2011Date of oral proceedings
02.02.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.02.2012
14.02.2012Date of oral proceedings
26.03.2012Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
05.04.2012Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2012/33]
Request for further processing for:10.07.2004Request for further processing filed
10.07.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.07.2004Decision despatched
02.12.2002Request for further processing filed
02.12.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.12.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
20.10.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
20.10.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200205   M06   Fee paid on   14.11.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR15.09.2004
IT15.09.2004
AT18.09.2008
CH30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
DE01.04.2011
[2011/35]
Former [2010/05]FR15.09.2004
IT15.09.2004
AT18.09.2008
Former [2008/12]FR15.09.2004
IT15.09.2004
Former [2006/32]FR15.09.2004
Former [2006/14]FR16.09.2005
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9312509  (PHOTOSTAR LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,6-14 * page 1 - page 7 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 5;
 [Y]US4991205  (LEMELSON JEROME H [US]) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 18 - column 2, line 23 *;
 [A]WO9522135  (DATACARD CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-3,6,24,26 * * figures 33,36,50,56 * * figures 57,59,64 *