blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0926666

EP0926666 - Optical pickup position control device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2007
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.02.2007  [2007/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/10]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Former [1999/26]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ohshita, Akihiro
11835-199, Zoga Takaya-cho
Higashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 739-2101 / JP
02 / Hino, Terufumi
10885-26, Hara Hachihonmatsu-cho
Higashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 739-0151 / JP
[1999/26]
Representative(s)Müller, Frithjof E.
Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date98117748.818.09.1998
[1999/26]
Priority number, dateJP1997036126426.12.1997         Original published format: JP 36126497
[1999/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0926666
Date:30.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0926666
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0926666
Date:08.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2000
ClassificationIPC:G11B7/09
[1999/26]
CPC:
G11B7/0941 (EP,US); G11B7/094 (EP,US); G11B7/0903 (EP,US);
G11B7/0908 (EP,US); G11B7/0948 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/52]
Former [1999/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Positionssteuerungsvorrichtung für optischen Lesekopf[1999/26]
English:Optical pickup position control device[1999/26]
French:Dispositif de commande de la position d'une tête de lecture optique[1999/26]
Examination procedure10.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
20.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
25.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
05.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.01.2006Fee for grant paid
04.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
28.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0745981  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,10 * abstract * * column 5, line 54 - column 9, line 18 * * column 24, line 1 - column 25, line 24 *;
 [XA]EP0392561  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,10 * abstract * * column 13, line 22 - column 19, line 48 * [A] 4-9,11-21;
 [A]EP0718832  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * column 4, line 19 - column 6 *;
 [PA]EP0831467  (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1-21 * abstract * * page 3, line 46 - page 4, line 31 *;
 [A]US5351224  (NAGATA SHIZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * column 5, line 24 - column 13, line 30 *;
 [A]US5347503  (KOYAMA OSAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * column 7, line 10 - column 17, line 56 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.