Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0911530

EP0911530 - Rotary-linear-unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Festo AG & Co.
Ruiter Strasse 82
73734 Esslingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]For all designated states
Festo AG & Co
Ruiter Strasse 82
73734 Esslingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Thorwart, Gerhard
Lange Strasse 109/1
70794 Filderstadt / DE
02 / Wagner, Albrecht
Beethovenstrasse 44
73650 Winterbach / DE
[1999/17]
Representative(s)Abel, Martin , et al
Patentanwälte
Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel
Plochinger Strasse 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]Abel, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Magenbauer Dipl.-Phys. Dr. O. Reimold Dipl.-Phys. Dr. H. Vetter Dipl.-Ing. M. Abel Hölderlinweg 58
73728 Esslingen / DE
Application number, filing date98118039.123.09.1998
[1999/17]
Priority number, dateDE1997219015U25.10.1997         Original published format: DE 29719015 U
[1999/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0911530
Date:28.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0911530
Date:11.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:F15B15/06, B25J9/14, B25J18/04
[1999/17]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/02]
Former [1999/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Dreh-Linear-Einheit[1999/17]
English:Rotary-linear-unit[1999/17]
French:Vérin à mouvements de translation et de rotation[1999/17]
Examination procedure24.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/17]
29.10.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.02.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
27.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2003Fee for grant paid
05.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.12.1999AT   M01   Not yet paid
02.12.1999BE   M01   Not yet paid
02.12.1999CY   M01   Not yet paid
02.12.1999DK   M01   Not yet paid
02.12.1999ES   M01   Not yet paid
02.12.1999GR   M01   Not yet paid
02.12.1999IE   M01   Not yet paid
02.12.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
02.12.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
02.12.1999NL   M01   Not yet paid
02.12.1999PT   M01   Not yet paid
02.12.1999SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4229989  (FESTO KG [DE]) [A] 1,8 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2893210  (MUSZYNSKI RICHARD S) [A] 1,8 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US3302469  (AURELIO ORTELLI) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5404983  (EICHER FRED C [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *