EP0911557 - Servo valve, especially a self closing valve or a pressure flush valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GROHEDAL Sanitärsysteme GmbH & Co.KG Zur Porta 8-12 D-32457 Porta Westfalica / DE | [2003/48] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states GROHEDAL GmbH & Co.KG Zur Porta 8-12 32457 Porta Westfalica / DE | ||
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states DAL-Georg Rost & Söhne Sanitärarmaturen GmbH Zur Porta 8-12 32457 Porta Westfalica / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blanke, Willfried Bastaustrasse 2 32427 Minden / DE | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Ziegler, Thomas Talstrasse 23 44267 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Ziegler, Thomas, Dr. Talstrasse 23 44267 Dortmund / DE | ||
Former [1999/17] | Troue, Ingo Parkstrasse 73 58675 Hemer / DE | Application number, filing date | 98118045.8 | 23.09.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | DE1997143443 | 01.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19743443 | [1999/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0911557 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0911557 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0911557 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16K21/12 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
F16K21/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/13] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Servoventil, insbesondere Selbstschlussventil oder Druckspüler | [1999/17] | English: | Servo valve, especially a self closing valve or a pressure flush valve | [1999/17] | French: | Servovalve, en particulier une soupape à fermeture automatique ou une soupape de chasse d'eau sous pression | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/07] | 20.01.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC | 30.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.02.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 14.07.2004 | SE | 14.07.2004 | [2005/18] |
Former [2004/52] | SE | 14.07.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2997271 (BOUNDS WALLACE A) [A] 1,2* column 2, lines 22-51; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]DE2603731 (ROST & SOEHNE GEORG) [DA] 1,2 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [A]US4825903 (OCHS RUDOLF [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 3, lines 3-50; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0373037 (TOTO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 10 * * column 7, lines 23-30; figure 3 * | by applicant | DE2603731 |