Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0904883

EP0904883 - Method for initiating an arc between a workpiece and a melting electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 19.03.2008  [2008/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fronius International GmbH
Nr. 319
4643 Pettenbach / AT
[2003/28]
Former [2000/32]For all designated states
FRONIUS Schweissmaschinen Produktion GmbH & Co. KG
Nr. 89
4643 Pettenbach / AT
Former [1999/13]For all designated states
FRONIUS SCHWEISSMASCHINEN KG AUSTRIA
Gewerbestrasse 15-17
A-4600 Wels/Thalheim / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Artelsmair, Josef
Hiersdorf 59
4552 Wartberg/Krems / AT
[1999/13]
Representative(s)Secklehner, Günter
Rechtsanwalt, Pyhrnstrasse 1
8940 Liezen / AT
[N/P]
Former [1999/13]Secklehner, Günter, Dr.
Rechtsanwalt, Pyhrnstrasse 1
8940 Liezen / AT
Application number, filing date98118066.424.09.1998
[1999/13]
Priority number, dateAT1997000164829.09.1997         Original published format: AT 164897
AT1998000041010.03.1998         Original published format: AT 41098
[1999/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0904883
Date:31.03.1999
Language:DE
[1999/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0904883
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0904883
Date:03.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B23K9/067
[1999/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
Former [1999/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Zünden eines Lichtbogens zwischen einem Werkstück und einer abschmelzenden Elektrode[1999/13]
English:Method for initiating an arc between a workpiece and a melting electrode[1999/13]
French:Méthode pour l'allumage d'un arc entre une pièce et une électrode fusible[1999/13]
Examination procedure05.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
28.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2003Fee for grant paid
18.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03010540.7  / EP1354659
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
03.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
09.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIE03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
PT03.08.2004
LU24.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
[2008/12]
Former [2007/17]IE03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
LU24.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
Former [2005/51]IE03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
BE30.09.2004
Former [2005/05]IE03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/03]IE03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2004/46]GR03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2004/41]GR03.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[XYA]EP0324960  (THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY) [X] 1,6,7,12,20,27,30 * column 17, paragraph L - column 18, paragraph 1 * * column 9, line 20 - line 26; figure 3 * [Y] 2,5,21 [A] 14,19,31-37;
 [Y]DE3523879  (CARL CLOOS SCHWEISSTECHNIK GMBH) [Y] 2,5,21 * Zusammenfassung;; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0547417  (FRONIUS SCHWEISSMASCHINEN KG AUSTRIA) [A] 3,4,8-11,14-18 * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 27; figure 4 *