Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0905536

EP0905536 - Optical module [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.10.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION
19-2 Nishi-Shinjuku 3-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-8019 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/13]For all designated states
Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation
19-2 Nishi-Shinjuku 3-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-8019 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hashimoto, Toshikazu Nippon Telegraph and Tel. Co.
20-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 3-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-1419 / JP
02 / Yamada, Yasufumi Nippon Telegraph and Teleph. Co.
20-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 3-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-1419 / JP
03 / Yanagisawa, Masahiro Nippon Telegraph and Tel. Co.
20-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 3-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-1419 / JP
04 / Kato, Kuniharu Nippon Telegraph and Telephone. Co.
20-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 3-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-1419 / JP
05 / Inoue, Yasuyuki Nippon Telegraph and Teleph. Co.
20-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 3-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-1419 / JP
[1999/13]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/33]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [1999/13]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date98118137.324.09.1998
[1999/13]
Priority number, dateJP1997026118126.09.1997         Original published format: JP 26118197
JP1998005499806.03.1998         Original published format: JP 5499898
[1999/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0905536
Date:31.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0905536
Date:13.11.2002
[2002/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0905536
Date:01.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/42, G02B6/122, G02B6/43
[2002/46]
Former International [1999/13]G02B6/42, G02B6/122
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/31]
Former [1999/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optischer Modul[1999/13]
English:Optical module[1999/13]
French:Module optique[1999/13]
Examination procedure29.09.1998Examination requested  [1999/13]
31.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2004Fee for grant paid
21.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0397337  (PLESSEY OVERSEAS [GB]) [X] 1-3,12 * column 2, lines 24-33; figure 2 * * column 2, lines 52-55 * * column 3, lines 40-43 * [Y] 6,7,13-24;
 [Y]EP0404301  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [Y] 6,7 * figure 3 *;
 [Y]JPH0738143  ;
 [YD]JPH095548  ;
 [Y]JPH09159854  ;
 [AP]EP0806685  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [AP] 1,15,17 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH06186451  ;
 [A]US4929515  (MATZ RICHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5475772  (HUNG HENRY H [US], et al) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract *;
 [A]US5321779  (KISSA KARL M [US]) [A] 1,10 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9608702  (SITEK ELECTRO OPTICS AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,3-5,7-9 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 1995, no. 05, [Y] 13,21-24 * abstract *
 [YD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, [YD] 14,15,17-20 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, [Y] 16,22-24 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941007), vol. 018, no. 532, Database accession no. (P - 1810), [A] 1,15,17 * abstract *