Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0907221

EP0907221 - Cable interconnection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.01.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.03.2004  [2004/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FCI
53, rue de Châteaudun
75009 Paris / FR
[2003/12]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
FCI
53, rue de Chateaudun
75009 Paris / FR
Former [1999/14]For all designated states
BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V.
Helftheuvelweg 11
5222 AV s'-Hertogenbosch / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Van Woensel, Johannes Maria Blasius
Anna Blamanstraat 60
5452 EG, Rosmalen / NL
[1999/14]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/24](deleted)
...
Former [1999/14]Geissler, Bernhard, Dr.jur., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patent- u. Rechtsanwälte Bardehle -Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg- Geissler-Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date98118347.829.09.1998
[1999/14]
Priority number, dateUS1997094182401.10.1997         Original published format: US 941824
US1998007606426.02.1998         Original published format: US 76064
US1998004181712.03.1998         Original published format: US 41817
[1999/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0907221
Date:07.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0907221
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0907221
Date:19.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/58, H01R13/627
[2000/08]
Former International [1999/14]H01R13/58
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [2000/44]
Former [1999/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Kabelsteckverbinder[1999/14]
English:Cable interconnection[1999/14]
French:Connecteur pour câbles électriques[1999/14]
Examination procedure11.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
24.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU
12.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.12.2002Fee for grant paid
09.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
26.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE19.03.2003
NL19.03.2003
SE19.06.2003
[2004/10]
Former [2003/50]NL19.03.2003
SE19.06.2003
Former [2003/41]NL19.03.2003
Documents cited:Search[PXDA]WO9747058  (BERG TECH INC [US], et al) [PXD] 7,8,12-15,26 * page 6, line 13 - line 29 * * page 12, line 6 - page 15, line 9 * * figures 9-18 * [A] 1-4;
 [XA]EP0600120  (MOLEX INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9-11,14,15 * column 6, line 7 - column 7, line 45 * * column 8, line 20 - line 42 * * figures 2-8 * [A] 12,13;
 [X]US4838808  (FUJIURA YOSHITSUGU [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6-11,14-17,21-24 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 12 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]DE3440043  (WIELAND ELEKTRISCHE INDUSTRIE [DE]) [X] 18-20 * page 8, line 18 - page 10, line 10 * * figures 2,3 *