Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991123

EP0991123 - Microstructure with a magnetic antenna or a magnetic detector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.09.2002
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.11.2002  [2002/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EM Microelectronic-Marin SA
Rue des Sors 3
2074 Marin / CH
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Darwish, Mougahed
Chemin des Vernets 30
2525 Le Landeron / CH
02 / Fuentes, Vincent
Chemin de la Payaz 3c
2025 Chez-le-Bart / CH
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis , et al
I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA, 7, rue des Sors
2074 Marin / CH
Application number, filing date98118595.201.10.1998
[2000/14]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991123
Date:05.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L23/64, H01L23/48, G06K19/077, G06K7/08, H01L23/498
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   LI,   NL [2000/50]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mikrostruktur mit einer magnetischen Antenne oder einem magnetischen Detector[2000/14]
English:Microstructure with a magnetic antenna or a magnetic detector[2000/14]
French:Microstructure munie d'une antenne magnétique ou d'un organe de détection magnétique[2000/14]
Examination procedure05.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
03.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/45]
06.06.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5710458  (IWASAKI HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1-8 * column 3, line 5 - line 27 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 17 * * figures 2-5 * [Y] 9;
 [XY]JPH07146922  ;
 [YA]US5337063  (TAKAHIRA KENICHI [JP]) [Y] 3-5,8 * column 3, line 19 - line 61 * * column 4, line 24 - line 42 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1,2;
 [X]US5083013  (LEVIONNAIS PHILIPPE [FR]) [X] 1 * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 25; figures 6,7 *;
 [A]JPS62134780  ;
 [A]JPH08194785  ;
 [Y]US4823136  (NATHANSON HARVEY C [US], et al) [Y] 9 * column 11, line 24 - line 59 * * column 11, line 49 - line 51 * * figures 8,8A-C *;
 [A]EP0388796  (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [A] 9 * column 1, line 25 - column 2, line 15 *;
 [A]DE3026911  (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) [A] 9 * page 5, line 11 - line 26 * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 11 * * page 7, line 5 *;
 [A]GB2311652  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 9 * page 25, paragraph 4 - page 26, paragraph 2; figure 9 *;
 [A]JPH09260587  ;
 JPH09260587  [ ];
 [A]EP0413348  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 6, line 19 - column 8, line 20 * * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 2 * * column 8, line 3 - line 4 *;
 [A]EP0782190  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 13 - line 20 * * page 3, line 8 - line 18 * * figure 5 *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 095, no. 009, & JP07146922 A 19950606 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 3-5,8
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871121), vol. 011, no. 358, Database accession no. (P - 639), & JP62134780 A 19870617 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 096, no. 011, & JP08194785 A 19960730 (SONY CORP) [A] 6,7 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 50, Database accession no. 97-542777, XP002109366 & JPH09260587 A 19971003 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1,8 * abstract *
    [] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 98, no. 002, & JP09260587 A 19971003 (TOSHIBA MICROELECTRON CORP;TOSHIBA CORP) [ ] * abstract *