Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0914996

EP0914996 - Hand brake with automatic adjusting device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  19.07.2002
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 04.09.2002  [2002/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ED. Scharwächter GmbH
Hohenhagener Strasse 26-28
42855 Remscheid / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/19]For all designated states
ED. Scharwächter GmbH
Hohenhagener-Strasse 26-28
42809 Remscheid / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bode, Sven
Remscheider Strasse 211
42855 Remscheid / DE
02 / Kopittke, Wolfgang
Oberhölterfelder Strasse 42
42857 Remscheid / DE
[1999/19]
Representative(s)Sparing, Rolf Klaus
Bonnekamp & Sparing Patentanwaltskanzlei European Patent & Trade Mark Law Firm Goltsteinstrasse 19
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]Sparing, Rolf Klaus
c/o Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr.-Ing. Horst Bonnekamp Bankstrasse 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1999/23](deleted)
...
Former [1999/19]Schön, Theodor, Patent- und Zivilingenieur
Sonnleiten 7
84164 Moosthenning / DE
Application number, filing date98118781.805.10.1998
[1999/19]
Priority number, dateDE199714955110.11.1997         Original published format: DE 19749551
[1999/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0914996
Date:12.05.1999
Language:DE
[1999/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0914996
Date:10.05.2000
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP27.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60T7/10, F16D65/52
[2000/19]
Former International [1999/19]B60T7/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/03]
Former [1999/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mit einer selbsttätigen Nachstelleinrichtung ausgestattete Hansbremse[1999/19]
English:Hand brake with automatic adjusting device[1999/19]
French:Frein à main avec dispositif automatique de rattrapage[1999/19]
Examination procedure05.10.1998Examination requested  [1999/19]
26.05.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.07.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0565768  (SCHARWAECHTER GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line L; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9527642  (KOBER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 26 * * page 9, line 9 - page 10, line 1; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5001942  (BOYER BILLY G [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 *