Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993133

EP0993133 - Data communications apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.12.2006  [2006/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Emmer, Dieter, Dr.-Ing.
Geschwister-Scholl-Ring 10
82110 Gemering / DE
02 / Franz, Volker
Edelweissstrasse 66
82178 Puchheim / DE
03 / Bahrenburg, Stefan, Dipl.-Ing.
Drygalski Allee 118
81477 München / DE
[2000/15]
Application number, filing date98118931.907.10.1998
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993133
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993133
Date:21.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP18.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/26, H04L1/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/51]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Datenkommunikationsverfahren und Vorrichtung[2000/15]
English:Data communications apparatus and method[2000/15]
French:Procédé et système de communication de données[2000/15]
Examination procedure18.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
12.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2005Fee for grant paid
22.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
18.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
21.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0643493  (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [Y] 1-23 * abstract * * page 3, line 5 - line 10 * * page 4, line 28 - line 47 * * figure 5; claims 1,2,9,10 *;
 [A]WO9716899  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 30 *
 [Y]  G. W. BEAKLEY, "Channel Coding for Digital HDTV Terrestrial Broadcasting", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BROADCASTING, (199112), vol. 37, no. 4, pages 137 - 140, XP002095480 [Y] 1-23 * page 137, column L, line 1 - column R, line 12 * * page 138, column L, line 6 - column R, line 20 * * page 139, column L, line 37 - column R, line 13 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/11.106200