Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0908989

EP0908989 - Rectangular marking template for electrical installation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.09.2002
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.11.2002  [2002/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dreschers, Rudolf
Zum Hagelkreuz 32
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
[1999/15]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/15]
Representative(s)König, Werner
Patentanwälte König & Kollegen Kackertstrasse 10
52072 Aachen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/15]König, Werner, Dipl.-Ing.
Habsburgerallee 23-25
52064 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date98119018.408.10.1998
[1999/15]
Priority number, dateDE1997217951U09.10.1997         Original published format: DE 29717951 U
[1999/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0908989
Date:14.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0908989
Date:31.05.2000
[2000/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02G1/00
[1999/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   IT,   NL [2001/06]
Former [1999/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Rechteckförmige Anreissschablone für Elektroinstallationen[1999/15]
English:Rectangular marking template for electrical installation[1999/15]
French:Gabarit rectangulaire de traçage pour installation électrique[1999/15]
Examination procedure30.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/05]
01.12.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.03.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, GB
01.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/46]
07.06.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.01.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
04.01.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3108437  (HENINGER ANTON) [A] 1 * page 11, line 31 - page 12, line 6; figure 4 *;
 [DA]DE9411054U  (BAUER JOSEF [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure -; claim - *