Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0910215

EP0910215 - Program authorizing circuit for consumer electronics and/or communications technology. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/16]Program releasing circuit for consumer electronics and/or communications technology
[2006/14]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2007
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.07.2007  [2007/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grundig Multimedia B.V.
De Boelelaan 7 Off. I 2hg
1083 HJ Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
Grundig Multimedia B.V.
De Boelelaan 7 Off. I 2hg
1083HJ Amsterdam / NL
Former [2000/50]For all designated states
GRUNDIG Aktiengesellschaft
Beuthener Strasse 41
90471 Nürnberg / DE
Former [1999/16]For all designated states
GRUNDIG Aktiengesellschaft
Kurgartenstrasse 37
90762 Fürth / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Reiss, Willy Grundig AG
Kurgartenstrasse 37
90762 Fuerth / DE
[1999/16]
Representative(s)Pröll, Jürgen , et al
Rechtsanwalt
Grundig Intermedia GmbH
Beuthener Strasse 41
90471 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/10]Pröll, Jürgen , et al
Rechtsanwalt Grundig Intermedia GmbH Beuthener Strasse 41
90471 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2004/34]Pröll, Jürgen
GRUNDIG Aktiengesellschaft, R-L 1, Patentabteilung, Beuthener Strasse 41
90471 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date98119045.708.10.1998
[1999/16]
Priority number, dateDE199714535714.10.1997         Original published format: DE 19745357
[1999/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0910215
Date:21.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0910215
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0910215
Date:26.07.2006
Language:DE
[2006/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/16
[1999/16]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/39]
Former [1999/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Freigabeprogrammierung für ein Gerät der Unterhaltungselektronik und/oder der Kommunikationstechnik.[2006/14]
English:Program authorizing circuit for consumer electronics and/or communications technology.[2006/14]
French:Circuit d'autorisation de programmes pour électronique grand public et/ou technologies de la communication.[2006/14]
Former [1999/16]Vorrichtung zur Freigabeprogrammierung für ein Gerät der Unterhaltungselektronik und/oder der Kommunikationstechnik
Former [1999/16]Program releasing circuit for consumer electronics and/or communications technology
Former [1999/16]Circuit de libération de programmes pour l'électronique grand public et/ou la technique de communication
Examination procedure05.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
23.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2006Fee for grant paid
02.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
16.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
20.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[YA]US5477262  (BACON KINNEY C ET AL) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-10;
 [YA]US5382983  (KWOH DANIEL S ET AL) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-10;
 [AD]DE29620150U  (KAU ET AL.) [AD] 1-10 * page 2, line 19 - page 8, line 16 *;
 [A]WO9606501  (KWOH DANIEL S ;MANKOVITZ ROY J (US)) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5331353  (LEVENSON RANDAL P ET AL) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]US5231661  (HARNUM NIELS ET AL) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0776132  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * column 8, line 6 - column 10, line 6 *;
 [A]WO9625821  (INDEX SYSTEMS INC) [A] 1-10 * abstract *