blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0911428

EP0911428 - Process for producing bismuth compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.11.2003
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.01.2004  [2004/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Goldschmidt AG
Goldschmidtstrasse 100
45127 Essen / DE
[2000/15]
Former [1999/17]For all designated states
Th. Goldschmidt AG
Goldschmidtstrasse 100
45127 Essen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Guhl, Dieter, Dr.
Nachtigallenweg 3
67346 Speyer / DE
02 / Honselmann, Frank
Ritter von Weingarten-Strasse 15
67366 Weingarten / DE
[1999/17]
Application number, filing date98119104.209.10.1998
[1999/17]
Priority number, dateDE199714647122.10.1997         Original published format: DE 19746471
[1999/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0911428
Date:28.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0911428
Date:08.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.1999
ClassificationIPC:C25B1/00, C01G29/00
[1999/17]
CPC:
C01G29/00 (EP,US); C25B1/00 (EP,US); C01P2006/10 (EP,US);
C01P2006/80 (EP,US); Y10S204/13 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/02]
Former [1999/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Wismutverbindungen[1999/17]
English:Process for producing bismuth compounds[1999/17]
French:Procédé pour la fabrication de composés de bismuth[1999/17]
Examination procedure17.10.1998Examination requested  [1999/17]
25.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2002Fee for grant paid
22.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchJPS464815  [ ] (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO., LTD.);
 [DX]JPH08246200  ;
 [A]WO9004048  (M & T CHEMICALS INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * page 7, line 13 - page 8, line 3 * * page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 19 *
 [X]  - SHIMATANI, YOSHIO ET AL, "Dissolution of bismuth", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19711213), vol. 75, no. 24, Database accession no. 147194, XP002088783 [X] 1,8,9 * abstract *
 [DX]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 48, Database accession no. 96-482644, XP002088784 & JPH08246200 A 19960924 (DAIWA KASEI KENKYUSHO KK) [DX] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.