Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992790

EP0992790 - Easy to manipulate strip shaped electrochemical sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.05.2009
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.07.2009  [2009/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASULAB S.A.
Rue des Sors 3
2074 Marin / CH
[2008/30]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
ASULAB S.A.
Faubourg du Lac 6
CH-2502 Bienne / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Frenkel, Erik Jan
Rue du Vully 29
2000 Neuchatel / CH
02 / Jaeger, Gérard
Chemin de Portaz 12
1807 Blonay / CH
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/52]Rossand, Isabelle , et al
ICB Ingenieurs Conseils en Brevets Rue des Sors 7
2074 Marin / CH
Former [2000/15]Thérond, Gérard Raymond , et al
I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7
2074 Marin / CH
Application number, filing date98119146.309.10.1998
[2000/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992790
Date:12.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992790
Date:23.07.2008
Language:FR
[2008/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/30
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/51]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Einfach handzuhabender streifenförmiger elektrochemischer Sensor[2000/15]
English:Easy to manipulate strip shaped electrochemical sensor[2000/15]
French:Capteur électrochimique en forme de languette facile à manipuler[2000/15]
Examination procedure12.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
25.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2008Fee for grant paid
11.06.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.04.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
02.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
31.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
31.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0787984  (ASULAB SA [CH]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO8700286  (ILEX CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 19, line 14 - line 15; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0645627  (ASULAB SA [CH]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *