EP0890396 - A device for the automatic replacement of the tools in a bending machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMADA COMPANY, LIMITED 200, Ishida, Isehara-shi Kanagawa, 259-1196 / JP | For all designated states CREA S.r.l. Via Asti 43 10026 Santena (Torino) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states AMADA COMPANY, LIMITED 200, Ishida, Isehara-shi Kanagawa, 259-1196 / JP | ||
For all designated states CREA S.r.l. Via Asti 43 10026 Santena (Torino) / IT | |||
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states AMADA COMPANY, LIMITED 200 Ishida Isehara-shi Kanagawa 259-11 / JP | ||
For all designated states CREA S.r.l. Via XX Settembre, 12 10121 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sartorio, Franco Corso Montevecchio 48 10129 Torino / IT | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1999/02] | Saconney, Piero, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 98119348.5 | 27.10.1994 | [1999/02] | Priority number, date | IT1993TO00818 | 29.10.1993 Original published format: IT TO930818 | [1999/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0890396 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0890396 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B21D37/04, B21D37/14 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
B21D43/105 (EP,US);
B21D11/20 (EP,US);
B21D37/04 (EP,US);
B21D37/145 (EP,US);
B21D5/02 (EP,US);
B21D5/0254 (EP,US);
Y10T483/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1999/02] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum automatisch Wechseln von Werkzeugen in einer Biegevorrichtung | [1999/02] | English: | A device for the automatic replacement of the tools in a bending machine | [1999/02] | French: | Dispositif de changement automatique d'outils dans une machine à plier | [1999/02] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 12.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94931177.3 / EP0725692 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4649622 (SCOTT WILLIAM B [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4991422 (SARTORIO FRANCO [IT]); | [A]EP0530375 (AMADA CO LTD [JP]) |