Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0915246

EP0915246 - Thrust reverser for an aircraft jet-engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.05.2004  [2004/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG
Eschenweg 11
15827 Dahlewitz / DE
[2001/12]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
Rolls-Royce Deutschland GmbH
Hohemarkstrasse 60 - 70
61440 Oberursel / DE
Former [1999/19]For all designated states
BMW Rolls-Royce GmbH
Postfach 12 46
61402 Oberursel / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Mundt, Christian, Dr.
Schmöckwitzer Strasse 21
15732 Eichwalde / DE
[1999/19]
Representative(s)Weber, Joachim , et al
Hoefer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Weber, Joachim, Dr. , et al
Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber & Partner Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29
81545 München / DE
Former [2000/20](deleted)
...
Former [1999/19]Schmidt, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Patentabteilung AJ-3
80788 München / DE
Application number, filing date98119577.916.10.1998
[1999/19]
Priority number, dateDE199714957610.11.1997         Original published format: DE 19749576
[1999/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0915246
Date:12.05.1999
Language:DE
[1999/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0915246
Date:12.07.2000
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0915246
Date:14.05.2003
Language:DE
[2003/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02K1/70, F02K1/60
[1999/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/12]
Former [1999/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schubumkehrvorrichtung eines Flug-Strahltriebwerkes[1999/19]
English:Thrust reverser for an aircraft jet-engine[1999/19]
French:Inverseur de poussée pour un réacteur d'avion[1999/19]
Examination procedure06.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
29.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2003Fee for grant paid
15.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
17.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0764779  (HISPANO SUIZA SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 9,10 *;
 [X]US4916895  (DUBOIS CLAUDE A G [FR]) [X] 1,2,4 * figure - *;
 [X]EP0368725  (HISPANO SUIZA SA [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * figure - *;
 [X]US3601992  (MAISON RICHARD L) [X] 1,2,4 * figure - *
by applicantEP0368725