Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0914995

EP0914995 - Device for cleaning a vehicle lamp glass [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.04.2005
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [1999/19]For all designated states
Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kober, Rainer
Schlossstrasse 33
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[1999/19]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2002/20]
Former [1999/19]Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing.
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date98119652.017.10.1998
[1999/19]
Priority number, dateDE199714940207.11.1997         Original published format: DE 19749402
[1999/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0914995
Date:12.05.1999
Language:DE
[1999/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0914995
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60S1/52, B60S1/60
[1999/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2000/44]
Former [1999/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Reinigungsvorrichtung für eine Scheibe einer Kraftfahrzeugleuchte[1999/19]
English:Device for cleaning a vehicle lamp glass[1999/19]
French:Dispositif pour nettoyer la glace de phare d'un véhicule[1999/19]
Examination procedure19.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
27.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/24]
13.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4285470  (ROTH DAVID W) [X] 1,3,5 * column 5, line 6 - column 6, line 3 *;
 [X]FR2394743  (SEIMA [FR]) [X] 1,3,5-8,10,13,14 * page 3, line 4 - line 40 *;
 [X]FR2674804  (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [X] 1,6-8,10,13-15 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 27 *;
 [X]DE2926305  (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1,5-8,11,12 * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 12 *;
 [X]DE4244453  (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [X] 1,6,8,11-14 * column 2, line 27 - line 46 *;
 [X]US3295004  (HIRSCH WILLIAM A) [X] 1,5-8,10 * column 2, line 1 - line 15 *;
 [X]US3469088  (COLEMAN NEIL A, et al) [X] 1,3,5-8,10 * column 2, line 3 - line 41 *;
 [X]US4088358  (HIRSCH WILLIAM A) [X] 1,5-8,10 * column 2, line 13 - line 49 *;
 [A]US4811903  (OKUMA SHIGEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 2 *;
 [A]FR2222856  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2285927  (BOWLES FLUIDICS CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * column W *