Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0911320

EP0911320 - 1,2-Di-substituted benzenecarboxamide derivative, hair growth promoter and external composition for skin using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.05.2003
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 30.07.2003  [2003/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED
5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8010 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]For all designated states
SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED
5-5 Ginza 7-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8010 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fukunishi, Hirotada
c/o Shiseido Research Center(1) 1050 Nippa-cho
Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa223-8553 / JP
02 / Umishio, Kenichi
c/o Shiseido Research Center(1) 1050 Nippa-cho
Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa223-8553 / JP
03 / Tajima, Masahiro
c/o Shiseido Research Center(1) 1050 Nippa-cho
Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa223-8553 / JP
04 / Kobayashi, Koji
c/o Shiseido Research Center(1) 1050 Nippa-cho
Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa223-8553 / JP
[1999/17]
Representative(s)Lippert, Hans-Joachim
Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Frankenforster Strasse 135-137
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]Lippert, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing.
Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner, Patentanwälte, Frankenforster Strasse 135-137
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date98119798.123.10.1998
[1999/17]
Priority number, dateJP1997030933523.10.1997         Original published format: JP 30933597
[1999/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0911320
Date:28.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0911320
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication 
No.:EP0911320
Date:14.06.2000
[N/P]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0911320
Date:24.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07C271/20, A61K7/06, C07D295/13, C07D295/205, C07D295/192, C07D233/61, C07C281/02, C07D295/32, C07D295/185, C07C271/12, A61K7/48
[1999/17]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/44]
Former [1999/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:1,2-Disubstituierte Benzenecarboxamid-Derivate, diese enthaltende Haarwuchsmittel und äusserliches Hauptpflegemittel[1999/17]
English:1,2-Di-substituted benzenecarboxamide derivative, hair growth promoter and external composition for skin using the same[1999/17]
French:Dérivés de benzenecarboxamide 1,2-disubstitués, agents favorisant la croissance des cheveux et composition pour la peau à usage externe les contenant[1999/17]
Examination procedure31.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
28.04.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
28.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, LU, MC, PT
28.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IE
12.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.05.2002Fee for grant paid
23.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)25.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
26.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH24.07.2002
LI24.07.2002
NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
[2003/31]
Former [2003/09]NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
Former [2003/03]SE24.10.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0627410  (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1,17-20 * page 11; example TEST4 * * page 20; example 13 *