Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996180

EP0996180 - Button cell support with vertical positioning [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 19.03.2008  [2008/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renata AG
Kreuzenstrasse 30
4452 Itingen / CH
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Rieder, Stefan
Sonnhalde 712
4207 Brekwil / CH
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Thérond, Gérard Raymond , et al
I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7
2074 Marin / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Thérond, Gérard Raymond , et al
I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7
2074 Marin / CH
Application number, filing date98120044.723.10.1998
[2000/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0996180
Date:26.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996180
Date:14.01.2004
Language:FR
[2004/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/10, H01M2/20, H05K5/00, H05K3/30
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2001/01]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Knopfzellenträger mit vertikaler Positionierung[2003/14]
English:Button cell support with vertical positioning[2000/17]
French:Support de pile-bouton à positionnement vertical[2000/17]
Former [2000/17]Knopfzellenträger mit verticaler Positionierung
Examination procedure26.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
28.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.2003Fee for grant paid
07.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES14.01.2004
GB14.01.2004
IT14.01.2004
NL14.01.2004
DE15.04.2004
[2008/12]
Former [2007/17]ES14.01.2004
GB14.01.2004
NL14.01.2004
DE15.04.2004
Former [2006/12]GB14.01.2004
NL14.01.2004
DE15.04.2004
Former [2005/12]GB14.01.2004
DE15.04.2004
Former [2004/45]GB14.01.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9708764  (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 12; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]WO9819354  (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 22; figures 1,8,9 *;
 [DA]GB2292635  (TSAI MEI LAN [TW]) [DA] 1 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 6; figure 2 *;
 [A]BE903314  (BIEVRE CHRISTOPHE DE)