Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995963

EP0995963 - Plate-type heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.06.2001
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.08.2001 [2001/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
De Vries, Hubert
Finkenweg 1
D-70771 Leinfelden-Unteraichen / DE
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Vetter, Hans , et al
Patentanwälte Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel Plochinger Strasse 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Vetter, Hans, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Rudolf Magenbauer Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Otto Reimold Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Hans Vetter, Dipl.-Ing. Martin Abel, H lderlinweg 58
73728 Esslingen / DE
Application number, filing date98120048.823.10.1998
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995963
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:F28D9/00, F28F3/12, F28F3/04
[2000/17]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/01]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Plattenförmiger Wärmeaustauscher[2000/17]
English:Plate-type heat exchanger[2000/17]
French:Echangeur de chaleur à plaques[2000/17]
Examination procedure27.10.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/31]
21.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/31]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.12.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
06.12.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
06.12.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE3000177  (FRIDERICHS PETER PROF DR ING [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [A] 9;
 [XA]WO9531686  (APV CORP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * page 9, paragraph L - page 12; figure -; claim 8 * [A] 7;
 [XA]US5429183  (HISAMORI YOUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,10 * column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 23; figures 1,3 * [A] 4,5;
 [A]EP0414435  (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1,2,4-6,9 * column 7, line 52 - column 8, line 27; figures 3-5 *;
 [A]FR2173424  (MARCO JEAN [FR]) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 4; figures 6-8 *
by applicantDE19524277