EP0995702 - Automatic handling device for flexible flat products, in particular catamenial products, and intermediate stacker unit to be used therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2001 [2001/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiedmann, Peter 72 Tracey Park Drive Belleville, ON K8P 5E4 / CA | 02 /
Kerr, Geoffrey John 47, Route de Saint-Georges 1213 Petit Lancy 1 / CH | [2001/16] |
Former [2000/17] | 01 /
Wiedmann, Peter 72 Tracey Park Drive Belleville, ON K8P 5E4 / CA | ||
02 /
Kerr, Geoffrey John Buchenweg 5 61440 Oberursel / DE | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Uwe T., et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 98120073.6 | 23.10.1998 | [2000/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0995702 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/52, B65G17/32 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
B65G47/52 (EP);
B65G17/32 (EP);
B65G47/082 (EP);
B65G2201/02 (EP);
B65G2201/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2001/01] |
Former [2000/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur automatischen Handhabung von flexiblen flachen Produkten, insbesondere hygienischen Einlagen, und Zwischenspeicher dafür | [2000/17] | English: | Automatic handling device for flexible flat products, in particular catamenial products, and intermediate stacker unit to be used therein | [2000/17] | French: | Dispositif pour la manutention automatique de produits plans flexibles, notamment de produits cataméniaux, et empileur intermédiaire associé | [2000/17] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/32] | 02.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.12.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.12.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3954165 (SNYDER CLARENCE A) [X] 7,12* abstract *; | [X]US4520925 (JOHNSON DOUGLAS M [US]) [X] 7 * column 4, lines 13-34; figures 1,2,5 *; | [X]EP0192206 (MICROHANDLING GMBH [DE]) [X] 7,8,12 * abstract *; | [Y]US5127209 (HUNTER STEFAN A [US]) [Y] 2 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 15; figures 1-5 *; | [XY]EP0534902 (SIG SCHWEIZ INDUSTRIEGES [CH]) [X] 1,6 * column 1, line 48 - column 3, line 7; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2 | by applicant | EP0356654 | EP0465207 | DE4342112 |