Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0913767

EP0913767 - A method and apparatus for affecting subsequent instruction processing in a data processor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.12.2003  [2003/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOTOROLA, INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
[1999/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Moyer, William C.
1005 Pier Branch Road
Dripping Springs, Texas 78620 / US
02 / Scott, Jeffrey W.
9801 Stonelake Blvd. Apt. 1334
Austin, Texas 78759 / US
[1999/18]
Representative(s)Gibson, Sarah Jane
Motorola
European Intellectual Property Operations
Midpoint
Alencon Link, Basingstoke
Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/18]Gibson, Sarah Jane
Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Application number, filing date98120220.326.10.1998
[1999/18]
Priority number, dateUS1997096332103.11.1997         Original published format: US 963321
[1999/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0913767
Date:06.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0913767
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0913767
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/38, G06F9/46
[2000/03]
Former International [1999/18]G06F9/38
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/40]
Former [1999/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Anordnung zur Veränderung der Durchführung eines Nachfolgebefehls in einem Dataprozessor[1999/18]
English:A method and apparatus for affecting subsequent instruction processing in a data processor[1999/18]
French:Méthode et appareil pour influer sur le traitement d'une instruction suivante dans un processeur de données[1999/18]
Examination procedure26.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
16.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2002Fee for grant paid
23.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9730391  (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 14 *;
 [A]US4435766  (HABER JUDITH G [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column A *;
 [A]WO9120039  (SUPERCOMPUTER SYSTEMS LTD [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 3, line 3 - line 12 *
 [XA]  BERSHAD B N, "PRACTICAL CONSIDERATIONS FOR NON-BLOCKING CONCURRENT OBJECTS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS,US,LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, vol. CONF. 13, ISBN 0-8186-3770-6, page 264-273, XP000399396 [X] 1,3-6,8 * page 265, column R, line 20 - page 266, column R, line 11 * [A] 2,7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDCS.1993.287700
 [XA]  MOSBERGER D ET AL, "IMPLEMENTING ATOMIC SEQUENCES ON INIPROCESSORS USING ROLLFORWARD", SOFTWARE PRACTICE & EXPERIENCE,GB,JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD. CHICHESTER, vol. 26, no. 1, ISSN 0038-0644, page 1-23, XP000655429 [X] 1,3-6,8 * page 1, line 23 - page 2, line 19 * * page 8, line 42 - page 9, line 30 * [A] 2,7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-024X(199601)26:1<1::AID-SPE998>3.3.CO;2-S