Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0901120

EP0901120 - Reading and writing stored information by means of electrochemistry [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.06.2004  [2004/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biotechnology and Research and Development Corporation
1815 North University Street
Peoria, IL 61604 / US
For all designated states
THE PENN STATE RESEARCH FOUNDATION
114 Kern Graduate Building
University Park, PA 16802 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/10]For all designated states
Biotechnology and Research and Development Corporation
1815 North University Street
Peoria, IL 61604 / US
For all designated states
THE PENN STATE RESEARCH FOUNDATION
114 Kern Graduate Building
University Park, PA 16802 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Weiss, Paul S.
545 Orlando Avenue
State College, Pennsylvania 16803 / US
02 / Stranick, Stephan J.
258 Toftrees Avenue, 315
State College, Pennsylvania 16801 / US
03 / Willis, Barry G.
26970 Arastradero Road
Los Altos Hills, California 94022 / US
[1999/10]
Representative(s)Shaya, Darrin Maurice
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/10]Shaya, Darrin Maurice
Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date98120485.216.07.1993
[1999/10]
Priority number, dateUS1992091616517.07.1992         Original published format: US 916165
US1992097959720.11.1992         Original published format: US 979597
US1993005634830.04.1993         Original published format: US 56348
US1993009201615.07.1993         Original published format: US 92016
US1993009213315.07.1993         Original published format: US 92133
[1999/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0901120
Date:10.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0901120
Date:10.01.2001
[2001/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP24.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:G11B9/00
[1999/10]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   LI [1999/10]
TitleGerman:Lesen und Schreiben von gespeicherter Information mittels Elektrochemie[1999/10]
English:Reading and writing stored information by means of electrochemistry[1999/10]
French:Lecture et écriture par voie électrochimique d'informations stockées[1999/10]
Examination procedure20.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/10]
04.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
16.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/24]
08.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/24]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93917239.1  / EP0650629
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
20.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
02.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
03.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
18.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200109   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.2002
31.07.200311   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0272935  (CANON KK [JP]) [DA] 1,5 * page 2, line 37 - line 40 * * page 3, line 7 - line 12 * * page 3, line 44 - line 59 * * page 14, line 61 - line 64 * * page 15, line 24 - line 29 * * page 15, line 46 - line 48 * * page 15, line 63 - page 16, line 1 * * page 16, line 45 - line 65 * * page 18, line 13 - line 54; figure 1; claims 1-6 *;
 [A]DE1173533  (LITTON INDUSTRIES INC) [A] 1-3,5-7,9 * column 3, line 25 - line 46 * * column 7, line 25 - line 68 * * column 9, line 36 - line 39 * * column 10, line 4 - line 15 *;
 [A]US3238511  (ANDERSON HAROLD C, et al) [A] 1-3,5-7,9 * column 5, line 38 - column 9, line 23; figure 7 *;
 [A]GB2157876  (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN) [A] 1,5,9 * page 2, line 56 - line 64 * * page 3, line 98 - line 127; figures 6,7 *;
 [A]US3973186  (UEHARA HIROMICHI, et al)