Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0913979

EP0913979 - Mobile telephone and method for operating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.06.2010
Database last updated on 23.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.07.2010  [2010/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IPCom GmbH & Co. KG
Zugspitzstrasse 15
82049 Pullach / DE
[2007/28]
Former [1999/18]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Weiss, Karl-Ernst
Hohewiesestrasse 55A
76275 Ettlingen / DE
[1999/18]
Representative(s)Gigerich, Jan , et al
Frohwitter
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 03 68
81630 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/20]Gigerich, Jan , et al
Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 03 68
81630 München / DE
Former [2009/09]Betten & Resch
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 51
80076 München / DE
Former [2007/28]Gigerich, Jan , et al
Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 03 68
81630 München / DE
Application number, filing date98120530.530.10.1998
[1999/18]
Priority number, dateDE199714805430.10.1997         Original published format: DE 19748054
[1999/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0913979
Date:06.05.1999
Language:DE
[1999/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0913979
Date:08.09.2004
[2004/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0913979
Date:05.08.2009
Language:DE
[2009/32]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP22.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/725
[2009/16]
Former International [2004/37]H04M1/725, H04Q7/32
Former International [1999/18]H04M1/72, H04Q7/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2005/21]
Former [1999/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Mobiltelefons und Mobiltelefon[1999/18]
English:Mobile telephone and method for operating the same[1999/18]
French:Téléphone mobile et méthode d'exploitation de celui ci[1999/18]
Examination procedure08.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/18]
02.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2009Date of oral proceedings
27.02.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.03.2009
27.02.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
16.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2009Date of oral proceedings
26.03.2009Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
16.06.2009Fee for grant paid
16.06.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.05.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
02.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
31.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
30.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
30.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9220167  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-4,7,16-18,22-24,28,31,33,35 * page 4, lines 22-34 * * page 6, lines 17-27 * * page 7, lines 11-27 * * page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 23 * * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 11 * * figures 2,5 * [Y] 5,6,25-27;
 [X]DE29617734U  (LOPATTA AMADEUS [DE]) [X] 1-4,19-24,28,31-35 * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 6 * * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 4 * * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 10 *;
 [X]WO9401963  (ROZGONYI JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1,3,8-15,23,29-33,35,36 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 7, paragraph 1 *;
 [Y]EP0665655  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 5,6,25-27 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 5 * * figures 3A,3B *