EP0918323 - Optical disk [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Go 19-5, Gakuenasahi-cho Nara-shi, Nara 631-0016 / JP | 02 /
Mieda, Michinobu 422-6, Iwami Miyake-cho Shiki-gun, Nara 636-0212 / JP | 03 /
Iketani, Naoyasu 2613-1-1024, Ichinomoto-cho Tenri-shi, Nara 632-0004 / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Ippei 2613-1-854, Ichinomoto-cho Tenri-shi, Nara 632-0004 / JP | 05 /
Murakami, Yoshiteru 16-40-108, Takagihigashimachi Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 663-8033 / JP | 06 /
Takahashi, Akira 45-104, 5-chome Suzaku Nara-shi, Nara 631-0806 / JP | [1999/21] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98120847.3 | 03.11.1998 | [1999/21] | Priority number, date | JP19970318710 | 19.11.1997 Original published format: JP 31871097 | [1999/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0918323 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0918323 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
G11B7/252 (EP,US);
G11B7/2578 (EP,KR,US);
G11B33/1433 (KR);
G11B7/24056 (EP,US);
G11B7/24067 (EP,US);
G11B11/10584 (EP,US);
G11B2007/25706 (EP,US);
G11B2007/25708 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2007/2571 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2007/25713 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2007/25715 (EP,US);
G11B2007/25718 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/20] |
Former [1999/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optische Platte | [1999/21] | English: | Optical disk | [1999/21] | French: | Disque optique | [1999/21] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 05.03.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 08.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/29] | 01.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.04.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0467705 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,13-15 * page 3, line 46 - page 4, line 6 * * page 4, line 13 - line 25 *; | [X]EP0365333 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,5-11,13-15,17-19 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH03250438 ; | JPH03250438 [ ]; | [X]US5293373 (TOIDE YUKARI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,13-15,17-19 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH04295646 ; | [DX]JPH05303769 ; | [L]US6067285 (OHTA KENJI [JP], et al) [L] * cited for language reasons; column 3 *; | [DX]JPH0467332 ; | [X]US5368908 (OHTA WASABURO [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,10,15 * the whole document *; | [X]US5251202 (KANEKO YUJIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,13,15 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920207), vol. 016, no. 050, Database accession no. (P - 1308), & JP03250438 A 19911108 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,6,8,9,11,15,19 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 51, Database accession no. 1991-372819, XP002141149 & JPH03250438 A 00000000 [ ] * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930303), vol. 017, no. 105, Database accession no. (P - 1495), & JP04295646 A 19921020 (RICOH CO LTD) [X] 1,9,10,13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0017]; example 3; table 1 * | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940224), vol. 018, no. 117, Database accession no. (P - 1699), & JP05303769 A 19931116 (SHARP CORP) [DX] 1,2,13-15 * abstract * | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920616), vol. 016, no. 266, Database accession no. (P - 1371), & JP04067332 A 19920303 (KYOCERA CORP) [DX] 1,13,16,17,19 * abstract * |