blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0999388

EP0999388 - Shaft seal with PTFE lip [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 09.12.2009  [2009/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc., A subsidiary of Ford Motor Company
911 Parklane Towers East Dearborn
Michigan 48126 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc., A subsidiary of Ford Motor Company
911 Parklane Towers East
Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kuhlen, Morten
Beller Strasse 51
41199 Mönchengladbach / DE
02 / Mayer, Guido
Abt-Horchem-Strasse 50
50734 Erftstadt / DE
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Drömer, Hans-Carsten
Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Patentabteilung NH/DRP
Henry-Ford-Strasse 1
50725 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]Drömer, Hans-Carsten
Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung NH/DRP Henry-Ford-Strasse 1
50725 Köln / DE
Former [2000/19]Drömer, Hans-Carsten, Dipl.-Ing.
Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung NH/DRP, Henry-Ford-Strasse 1
50725 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date98120959.605.11.1998
[2000/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0999388
Date:10.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.1999
ClassificationIPC:F16J15/32
[2000/19]
CPC:
F16J15/3244 (EP); F16J15/3228 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/03]
Former [2000/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:PTFE Manschetten-Wellendichtung[2000/19]
English:Shaft seal with PTFE lip[2000/19]
French:Bague d'étanchéité à lèvre en PTFE[2000/19]
Examination procedure06.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/19]
15.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/23]
17.01.2005Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5755444  (CARNIS PATRICK [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 3, lines 35-58; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US3913925  (GYORY EMERIC J) [Y] 1,2 * column 1, lines 35-37 * * column 1, lines 53-66 * * column 3, line 4 - line 6 * * figure 5 *;
 [A]EP0754892  (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 29-37; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19539057  (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE1284203  (GOETZEWERKE) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 53-57 * * column 2, line 53 - line 68 * * figure . *;
 [A]US3044786  (CHILLSON CHARLES W) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 5-11 - lines 36-44; figure 7 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.