Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976931

EP0976931 - Device for adjusting the central position of the pistons and the angular position of the pinion in a valve driving actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.09.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.10.2004  [2004/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
G.T. Componenti Srl
Via Delfinoni, 29
27022 Casorate Primo (PV) / IT
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Trevisan, Giovanni
Via Alfieri, 24
20090 Trezzano sul Naviglio (Milano) / IT
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Cicogna, Franco
Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti
Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna
Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Cicogna, Franco
Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98121029.705.11.1998
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateIT1998MI0176629.07.1998         Original published format: IT MI981766
[2000/05]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976931
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:F15B15/24, F15B15/08
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/41]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Einstellung der Zentrallage der Kolben und des Winkelgrads des Ritzels eines Ventilaktuators[2000/05]
English:Device for adjusting the central position of the pistons and the angular position of the pinion in a valve driving actuator[2000/05]
French:Dispositif pour l'ajustement de la position centrale des pistons et de la position angulaire d'un pignon d'un vérin qui entraîne une soupape[2000/05]
Examination procedure19.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/12]
22.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/43]
21.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2309747  (HYTEK TECH INT [GB]) [X] 1-5 * page 8, line 8 - line 23; figures 1A,1B *;
 [X]EP0697527  (PRIME ACTUATOR CONTROL SYSTEMS [GB], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 36 - line 53; figure - *;
 [X]US3148595  (LOONEY JOHN T) [X] 1 * figures 1,3,5 *