blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0902338

EP0902338 - Image printing apparatus and image printing method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.09.2002
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.10.2002  [2002/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/44]For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
Former [1999/11]For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-01 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okuda, Masakazu
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-01 / JP
02 / Otsuka, Yasuhiro
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-01 / JP
[1999/11]
Representative(s)Abnett, Richard Charles
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London
WC1X 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/22]Abnett, Richard Charles
REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Former [1999/11]Mohun, Stephen John
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road
GB-London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date98121034.724.05.1995
[1999/11]
Priority number, dateJP1994010884824.05.1994         Original published format: JP 10884894
JP1994012998613.06.1994         Original published format: JP 12998694
[1999/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0902338
Date:17.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0902338
Date:31.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.1999
ClassificationIPC:G03G15/32
[1999/11]
CPC:
G03G15/32 (EP,US); G03G15/321 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1999/11]
TitleGerman:Gerät und Verfahren zum Drucken eines Bildes[1999/11]
English:Image printing apparatus and image printing method[1999/11]
French:Appareil et méthode d'impression d'une image[1999/11]
Examination procedure12.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/11]
11.10.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.01.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2001Fee for grant paid
10.04.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95303515.1  / EP0684531
Opposition(s)01.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DX]US5185619  (SNELLING CHRISTOPHER [US]) [DX] 1,3,6 * column 1, paragraph 2; figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 19 * * column 5, line 57 - column 7, line 58 *;
 [DA]US3935327  (TAYLOR ALLEN L) [DA] 1,3,6 * figures 1,2; claims 1-3 * * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 22 *;
 [A]EP0510963  (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,6 * figures 1-3; claim 1 * * column 5, line 7 - column 8, line 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.