Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0923879

EP0923879 - Process and apparatus for cooling of high consistency sauces with lumpy inserts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.11.2001
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2002  [2002/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
A. STEPHAN U. SÖHNE GMBH & CO.
Stephanplatz 2
D-31789 Hameln / DE
[1999/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Köllner, Friedrich
Steineiche 12
31840 Hess. Oldendorf / DE
[1999/25]
Representative(s)Gramm, Werner , et al
GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/25]Gramm, Werner, Prof. Dipl.-Ing. , et al
GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
Application number, filing date98121051.106.11.1998
[1999/25]
Priority number, dateDE199715713420.12.1997         Original published format: DE 19757134
[1999/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0923879
Date:23.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0923879
Date:12.07.2000
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/29, A23L3/36, A23L3/22, A23L1/39, A23L3/015, A23G3/04
[2000/27]
Former International [1999/25]A23L1/29, A23L3/36, A23L3/22
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/12]
Former [1999/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kühlung dickflüssiger Sossen mit stückigen Einlagen[1999/25]
English:Process and apparatus for cooling of high consistency sauces with lumpy inserts[1999/25]
French:Procédé et appareil de refroidissement de sauces épaisses avec garniture en morceaux[1999/25]
Examination procedure13.01.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/01]
31.07.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/01]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.02.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
23.02.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
23.02.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5829224  (SIZER CHARLES [US]) [Y] 1-5,8 * the whole document *;
 [Y]GB2120076  (BRIERLEY COLLIER AND HARTLEY E) [Y] 1-5,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9609841  (H K M COMPANY CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]JPS62175150  ;
 [A]EP0570953  (CIRIO BERTOLLI DE RICA SOCIETA [IT]);
 [A]GB1253905  (SCHROEDER & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5125168  (AIGELDINGER JEAN-CLAUDE [CH]);
 [A]US4361083  (NATUSCH HANS-JOERG)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880122), vol. 012, no. 022, Database accession no. (C - 470), [A] 1,5 * abstract *