Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0916890

EP0916890 - Method and apparatus for precooling a mass prior to immersion in a cryogenic liquid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.
7201 Hamilton Boulevard
Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US
[1999/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Morton, Stanley Louis
5361 Princeton Road
Macungie, PA 18062 / US
02 / Schuck, Thomas, Winter
34 0ld 0rchard Drive
Easton, PA 18045 / US
03 / Chalk, David, Jonathan
6210 Venture Court
Slatington, PA 18080 / US
04 / Huang, Xianrui
1017 Oak Chase Lane
Florence, South Carolina 29501 / US
05 / Bischke, Lawrence, Vincent
3307 E. Wiwipak Drive
Florence, South Carolina 29506 / US
06 / O'Shea, Shaun Patrick
3906 Eagle Street
Florence, South Carolina 29501 / US
[1999/20]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/20]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date98121171.712.11.1998
[1999/20]
Priority number, dateUS1997097037614.11.1997         Original published format: US 970376
[1999/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0916890
Date:19.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0916890
Date:26.07.2000
[2000/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:F17C13/00
[1999/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/20]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Vorkühlen vor dem Untertauchen in eine kryogene Flüssigkeit[1999/20]
English:Method and apparatus for precooling a mass prior to immersion in a cryogenic liquid[1999/20]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour le prérefroidissement avant l'immersion dans un liquide cryogénique[1999/20]
Examination procedure01.02.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US5187938  (MRAZ BEAT [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8 * column W *;
 [A]US4884409  (QUACK HANS [CH], et al) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]JPS61214403  ;
 [A]US4284894  (SITTE HELLMUTH, et al) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US4926646  (DORRI BIZHAN [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870217), vol. 011, no. 051, Database accession no. (E - 480), [A] 1 * abstract *