EP0982784 - Battery pack for an implantable medical device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cochlear Limited 14 Mars Road Lane Cove, NSW 2066 / AU | [2002/01] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states IMPLEX Aktiengesellschaft Hearing Technology Münchener Strasse 101 85737 Ismaning / DE | ||
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states IMPLEX GmbH Spezialhörgeräte Münchner Strasse 101 D-85737 Ismaning / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leysieffer, Hans Dr.-Ing. Enzianring 13 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard, et al Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Elfenstrasse 32 81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98121610.4 | 12.11.1998 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | DE1998137912 | 20.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19837912 | [2000/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0982784 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982784 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01M6/50, A61N1/362, A61N1/378, A61N1/375, H01M10/44, H01M2/34 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
H04R25/554 (EP,US);
H04R2225/31 (EP,US);
H04R2225/67 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/45] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Energieversorgungsmodul für eine implantierbare Vorrichtung | [2000/09] | English: | Battery pack for an implantable medical device | [2000/09] | French: | Système de batteries pour dispositif médical implantable | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 03.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 03.04.2002 | NL | 03.04.2002 | DK | 03.07.2002 | SE | 03.07.2002 | ES | 30.10.2002 | AT | 12.11.2002 | BE | 30.11.2002 | CH | 30.11.2002 | LI | 30.11.2002 | [2008/12] |
Former [2004/14] | NL | 03.04.2002 | |
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
AT | 12.11.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
CH | 30.11.2002 | ||
LI | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | NL | 03.04.2002 | |
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
CH | 30.11.2002 | ||
LI | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | NL | 03.04.2002 | |
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
CH | 30.11.2002 | ||
LI | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | NL | 03.04.2002 | |
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
CH | 30.11.2002 | ||
LI | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/40] | NL | 03.04.2002 | |
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
CH | 30.11.2002 | ||
LI | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 03.04.2002 | |
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 03.07.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3824129 (FAGAN F) [A] 1-23* the whole document *; | [Y]US4082097 (MANN ALFRED E, et al) [Y] 1-23 * column 4, line 57 - column 6, line 3 * * column 7, lines 38-62 *; | [Y]US4275739 (FISCHELL ROBERT E) [Y] 1-23 * column 2, lines 22-28 * * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 2 *; | [Y]US5314451 (MULIER PETER M J [US]) [Y] 1-23 * column 5, lines 23-53 * * figure -; claim - *; | [Y]US5411537 (MUNSHI MOHAMMED Z [US], et al) [Y] 1-23 * column 11, lines 43-62 * * figure -; claim - * |