Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0924712

EP0924712 - Markings support for electrical conductor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.12.2005
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.02.2006  [2006/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Paderborner Strasse 175
32760 Detmold / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/06]For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co.
Paderborner Strasse 175
32760 Detmold / DE
Former [1999/25]For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co.
Paderborner Strasse 175
D-32760 Detmold / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wieneke, Andreas
Hummerntruper Strasse 34a
32657 Lemgo / DE
02 / Pampel, Jürgen
Herforder Strasse 114a
32602 Vlotho / DE
03 / Klinger, Wolfgang
Schickergasse 11
53842 Troisdorf / DE
[1999/25]
Representative(s)Stracke, Alexander , et al
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/25]Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Jöllenbecker Strasse 164
33613 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date98121683.113.11.1998
[1999/25]
Priority number, dateDE1997222178U16.12.1997         Original published format: DE 29722178 U
[1999/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0924712
Date:23.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0924712
Date:20.09.2000
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0924712
Date:09.02.2005
Language:DE
[2005/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01B7/36, G09F3/04
[2000/38]
Former International [1999/25]H01B7/36
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2001/23]
Former [1999/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bezeichnungsträger für elektrische Leiter[1999/25]
English:Markings support for electrical conductor[1999/25]
French:Porte-repères pour conducteur électrique[1999/25]
Examination procedure28.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
13.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.2004Fee for grant paid
28.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US5115586  (HAWKER MICHAEL J [GB]) [X] 1,2,6,8,9 * column 2, line 6 - column 4, line 43; figures 1-12 *