blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0924397


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.07.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  27.08.2003  [2003/35]
19.07.2002 (Expected) grant published on  04.09.2002  [2002/36]
07.06.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.03.2002 Communication of intention to grant
13.03.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.02.2002 Communication of intention to grant
08.11.2001 Renewal fee
24.10.2001 Examination report or reply
29.06.2001 First examination report
27.06.2001 Examination report or reply
07.11.2000 Renewal fee
16.03.2000 Change - extension states
14.01.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  01.03.2000 [2000/09]
03.12.1999 Request for examination filed published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
07.05.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.06.1999 [1999/25]